blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0647438 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0647438



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
08.12.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.06.1999 Decision on interlocutory revision Search / examination 1
22.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.05.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.04.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.04.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 3
07.04.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 2
01.04.1999 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Search / examination 2
06.03.1999 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
20.10.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
20.10.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
08.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
24.09.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.11.1997 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.10.1997 Request for assignment Search / examination 5
13.02.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.02.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
19.03.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
19.03.1994 Description Search / examination 8
19.03.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.1994 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.03.1994 Priority document Search / examination 15
19.03.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6