blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0647438


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.12.2009 Change - representative published on  13.01.2010  [2010/02]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
10.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
26.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
22.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
17.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.06.1999 Interlocutory revision of appeal
12.05.1999 Change - appeal
30.03.1999 Application refused
23.03.1999 Renewal fee
16.10.1998 First examination report
15.10.1998 Communication of intention to grant
09.10.1998 Change - German title published on  25.11.1998 [1998/48]
18.03.1998 Renewal fee
28.11.1997 Change - applicant published on  14.01.1998 [1998/03]
28.11.1997 Change - representative published on  14.01.1998 [1998/03]
20.03.1997 Renewal fee
16.03.1996 Renewal fee
06.04.1995 Request for examination filed published on  24.05.1995 [1995/21]
24.02.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.1995 [1995/15]