blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0647438
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59409069D 17.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE59409069 19.03.1994
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5618301 08.04.1997A
Priority number Date
US18269794 13.01.1994
US58868896 19.01.1996
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5876418 02.03.1999A
Priority number Date
US83489197 07.04.1997
US18269794 13.01.1994
US58868896 19.01.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH07112028Global Dossier 02.05.1995A
Priority number Date
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0647438Global Dossier 12.01.2000B1
EP0647438 12.04.1995A1
Priority number Date
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT188603T 15.01.2000T
Priority number Date
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4334140 18.04.1996C2
DE4334140 13.04.1995A1
Priority number Date
DE4334140 07.10.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2144465T 16.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE4334140 07.10.1993