Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0647438

EP0647438 - Reduction stent and device with this stent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/15]Reduction stent, device with this stent and use of this stent
[1998/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Angiomed GmbH & Co. Medizintechnik KG
Wachhausstrasse 6
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/03]For all designated states
ANGIOMED GmbH & Co. Medizintechnik KG
Wachhausstrasse 6
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [1995/15]For all designated states
ANGIOMED AG
Wachhausstrasse 6
D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hauenstein, Karlheinz, Hans, Prof. Dr
Birkenweg 12
D-79288 Gottenheim / DE
02 / Lindenberg, Josef
Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 10a
D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE
[1995/15]
Representative(s)Lempert, Jost
LICHTI Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Lempert, Jost
LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [1995/15]Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date94104360.619.03.1994
[1995/15]
Priority number, dateDE1993433414007.10.1993         Original published format: DE 4334140
[1995/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0647438
Date:12.04.1995
Language:DE
[1995/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0647438
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[1995/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/15]
TitleGerman:Reduzierstent und Vorrichtung mit Reduzierstent[1998/48]
English:Reduction stent and device with this stent[1998/48]
French:Stent à réduction et dispositif avec ce stent[1998/48]
Former [1995/15]Reduzierstent, Vorrichtung mit Reduzierstent und Verwendung eines Reduzierstents
Former [1995/15]Reduction stent, device with this stent and use of this stent
Former [1995/15]Stent à réduction, dispositif avec ce stent et utilisation de ce stent
Examination procedure25.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
20.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.04.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
22.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination06.05.1999Appeal received
06.05.1999Statement of grounds filed
22.06.1999Interlocutory revision of appeal
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]DK12.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP0587197  (ANGIOMED AG) [AP] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 52 - line 56 * * column 3, line 19 - line 49; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4501263  (HARBUCK) [A] 1,9 * column A; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0556850  (ENDOTECH LTD.) [A] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9308767  (NEW ENGLAND DEACONESS HOSPITAL CORPORATION)
ExaminationEP0481365