Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0618250

EP0618250 - Process for producing lactic acid-based copolyester and packaging material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC.
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]For all designated states
DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC.
35-58, Sakashita 3-chome
Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ebato, Hiroshi
3-5-1-304, Osakidai
Sakura-shi, Chiba / JP
02 / Oya, Satoshi
4-4-636, Tatsumidai Higashi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP
03 / Kakizawa, Yasutoshi
818-3-404, Sonnocho, Inage-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
04 / Furuta, Hideyuki
4-4, Tatsumidai Higashi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP
05 / Arai, Kosuke
4-27-5, Tsuganodai, Wakaba-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
[1994/40]
Representative(s)Kraus, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]Kraus, Walter, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date94104896.928.03.1994
[1994/40]
Priority number, dateJP1993007346231.03.1993         Original published format: JP 7346293
JP1993007346531.03.1993         Original published format: JP 7346593
JP1993007346831.03.1993         Original published format: JP 7346893
JP1993027192829.10.1993         Original published format: JP 27192893
JP1993032706824.12.1993         Original published format: JP 32706893
[1994/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0618250
Date:05.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0618250
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/91, C08G63/60
[1994/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1994/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Copolyestern auf Basis von Milchsäure und Verpackungsmaterial[1994/40]
English:Process for producing lactic acid-based copolyester and packaging material[1994/40]
French:Procédé des préparation de copolyesters à base d'acide lactique et matériau d'emballage[1994/40]
Examination procedure20.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/20]
08.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2000Fee for grant paid
13.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PA]US5202413  (SPINU MARIA [US]) [PA] 1,3,7,13,14,16,17 * example 1; claims 1,5,9 *;
 [A]EP0115403  (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1,4,8,13,17 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 7; claims 1,6,7,10,11 *;
 [A]JPS496554B
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 74, no. 09, Database accession no. 74-16776V, & JPS496554B B1 19740214 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO. LTD) [A] 1,4,8,12,15,17 * abstract *