blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0609912 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0609912



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 734
20.05.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
07.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.10.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
08.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
30.06.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
28.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.05.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
22.05.1998 Description Search / examination 2
22.05.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.01.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 20
14.03.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.01.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.09.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.10.1994 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
04.08.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.08.1994 European search report Search / examination 4
29.03.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 1
29.03.1994 Description Search / examination 40
29.03.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.1994 Drawings Search / examination 18
29.03.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 24
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 26
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 19
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 24
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 26
02.01.1990 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 33
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 22
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 25
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 25
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 29
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 23
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 30
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 30
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 24
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.06.1989 Priority document Search / examination 24