blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0609912


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.05.2009 Change - representative published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
03.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
25.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.07.1999 Renewal fee
05.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.07.1998 Renewal fee
27.05.1998 Examination report or reply
12.01.1998 Examination report or reply
10.07.1997 Renewal fee
20.03.1997 Examination report or reply
14.01.1997 Examination report or reply
13.09.1996 First examination report
11.09.1996 Examination report or reply
09.07.1996 Renewal fee
23.11.1994 Request for examination filed published on  11.01.1995 [1995/02]
03.08.1994 Publication of search report published on  21.09.1994 [1994/38]
24.06.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.08.1994 [1994/32]