blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0609912

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 LI 
Examination procedure08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted05.01.2000
Opposition procedure06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.12.2000 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.08.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE FR GB LI
 
Event date:10.08.1994 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:344806
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:21.09.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE FR GB LI
 
Event date:11.01.1995 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19941111
 
Event date:30.10.1996 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19960904
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE FR GB LI
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:188554
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000115
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:344806
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:10.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69422433
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000210
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:15.03.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG
 
Event date:24.03.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:25.05.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20060525
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.05.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20060530
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.05.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20060531
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:08.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20060608
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:13.06.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20060613
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:17.08.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20060817
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.08.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Free Format Text:ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA#36-9, MAENO-CHO 2-CHOME ITABASHI-KU#TOKYO 174-8639 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA#36-9, MAENO-CHO 2-CHOME ITABASHI-KU#TOKYO 174-8639 (JP)
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO K.K.
Effective DATE:20070630
 
Event date:15.02.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:27.02.2008 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20070602
 
Event date:29.02.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070602
 
Event date:31.03.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070630
 
Event date:25.04.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20080229
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070630
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080101
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070630
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070602
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070702