Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0609912

EP0609912 - Apparatus for selectively positioning a correcting optical element in a camera [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
36-9, Maeno-cho 2-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1994/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Nomura, Hiroshi, c/o Asahi Kogaku Kogyo K.K.
36-9, Maenocho 2-chome
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/32]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert
Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Former [1994/32]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Postfach 86 07 48
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date94104979.302.06.1989
[1994/32]
Priority number, dateJP1988013701903.06.1988         Original published format: JP 13701988
JP1988008359224.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8359288
JP1988008359324.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8359388
JP1988008359424.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8359488
JP1988008359524.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8359588
JP1988008473327.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8473388
JP1988008473427.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8473488
JP1988008473527.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8473588
JP1988008473627.06.1988         Original published format: JP 8473688
JP1988008955706.07.1988         Original published format: JP 8955788
JP1988008955806.07.1988         Original published format: JP 8955888
JP1988009707522.07.1988         Original published format: JP 9707588
[1994/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0609912
Date:10.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0609912
Date:21.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0609912
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/10, G03B17/00, G03B17/04
[1994/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1994/32]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur selektiven Positionierung eines korrigierenden optischen Elements in einer Kamera[1994/32]
English:Apparatus for selectively positioning a correcting optical element in a camera[1994/32]
French:Appareil pour placer un élément optique correctif dans un appareil photographique[1994/32]
Examination procedure11.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/02]
04.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89110047.1  / EP0344806
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO8707038  (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 US4944030  [ ] (HARAGUCHI KEISUKE [JP], et al);
 [A]US4582411  (OHMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]JPS58120227  ;
 [DPA]US4833497  (SUGAWARA SABURO [JP]) [DPA] 1 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831013), vol. 7, no. 231, Database accession no. (P - 229), [A] 1 * abstract *