Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0619502

EP0619502 - Scanning optical rangefinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOLLMORGEN CORPORATION
Reservoir Place, 1601 Trapelo Road
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/41]For all designated states
KOLLMORGEN CORPORATION
Reservoir Place, 1601 Trapelo Road
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Taylor, William H.
Plain Road
South Deerfield, MA 01373 / US
[1994/41]
Representative(s)Königseder, geb. Egerer, Claudia
Kreuzbichl 1
82491 Grainau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/41]Königseder-Egerer, Claudia D.
Kreuzbichl 1
D-82491 Grainau / DE
Application number, filing date94105277.105.04.1994
[1994/41]
Priority number, dateUS1993003876708.04.1993         Original published format: US 38767
[1994/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0619502
Date:12.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0619502
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0619502
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/88, G01S17/42, G01S7/48
[1994/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/30]
Former [1994/41]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Abtaster und Entfernungsmesser[1994/41]
English:Scanning optical rangefinder[1994/41]
French:Télémètre optique à balayage[1994/41]
Examination procedure16.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/33]
03.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.1999Fee for grant paid
10.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL16.02.2000
SE16.05.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2001/09]SE16.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9009142  (RETINA FOUND EYE RES INST [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,11,19-21,24-30,35,36,39,40 * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 15; figure 2 * * page 21, line 1 - page 23, line 11 * [A] 2,4,10,12-18,22,23,31-34,37,38;
 [Y]EP0473866  (KOLLMORGEN CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,11,19-21,24-26,28-30,35,36,39,40 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 44; figure - * * page 4, line 20 - page 4, line 52 *;
 [Y]DE3502634  (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [Y]GB2070879  (MARCONI CO LTD) [Y] 20,35 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]DE4108057  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [Y] 25,39 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0170038  (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [Y] 27 * figure 2 *;
 [DA]GB2135789  (KOLLMORGEN TECH CORP) [DA] 2,5-40 * page 2, line 62 - page 7, line 34; figure - *
ExaminationGB2101352