blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0621396

EP0621396 - Method and composition for preserving core sample integrity using an encapsulating material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED
3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200
Houston TX 77027 / US
[2008/36]
Former [1998/25]For all designated states
BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED
3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 P.O. Box 4740
Houston Texas 77210-4740 / US
Former [1994/43]For all designated states
BAKER-HUGHES INCORPORATED
3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 P.O. Box 4740
Houston Texas 77210-4740 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Collee, Pierre Emmanuel
5122 Natural Bridge Drive
Kingwood, Texas 773345 / US
02 / Mallow, William A.
10041 Rafter S. Trail
Helotes, Texas 78023 / US
03 / Radford, Steven R.
9863 Winding Way
South Jordan, Utah 84065 / US
[1994/43]
Representative(s)Busse & Busse
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/43]Busse & Busse Patentanwälte
Postfach 12 26
D-49002 Osnabrück / DE
Application number, filing date94106204.421.04.1994
[1994/43]
Priority number, dateUS1993005109321.04.1993         Original published format: US 51093
[1994/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0621396
Date:26.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0621396
Date:09.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0621396
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1994
ClassificationIPC:E21B43/25, E21B25/08
[1994/43]
CPC:
C09K8/92 (EP,US); C09K8/60 (EP,US); E21B25/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zum Konservieren der Integrität eines Bohrkerns unter Verwendung von einem einkapselenden Material[1998/25]
English:Method and composition for preserving core sample integrity using an encapsulating material[1994/43]
French:Méthode et composition pour conserver l'intégrité d'un échantillon en utilisant un matériau encapsulant[1998/25]
Former [1994/43]Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zum Konservieren der Integrität eines Bohrkerns unter Verwendung von eingekapseltem Materials
Former [1994/43]Méthode et composition pour conserver l'intégrité d'une échantillon en utilisant du matériau encapsulé
Examination procedure02.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/26]
27.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.10.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.1998Fee for grant paid
09.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.06.1998
[1999/27]
Documents cited:Search[A]  - MERCK & CO INC, "Gelatin-free system for soft-hard capsules and encapsulating films - contg. gellan gum modified with plasticisers e.g. ethylene] glycol] and polymers e.g. sodium carboxymethyl cellulose", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 03, Database accession no. 92-022020 [A] 1,4 * abstract *
    [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH, GB, (19911210), vol. 332, no. 006
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.