Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0622868

EP0622868 - Data communications outlet kit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Former [1994/44]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Götz, Klaus Peter
Magnolienstrasse 4
D-64653 Lorsch / DE
02 / Schwan, Rainer
Bischof-Dieter-Strasse 8
D-64683 Einhausen / DE
03 / Feldmeier, Günter
Lindenstrasse 18c
D-64653 Lorsch / DE
[1994/44]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/44]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date94106690.428.04.1994
[1994/44]
Priority number, dateGB1993000885029.04.1993         Original published format: GB 9308850
[1994/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0622868
Date:02.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0622868
Date:04.06.1997
[1997/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0622868
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/502
[1994/44]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/44]
TitleGerman:Anschlussdosen-Montagesatz für Datenübertragung[1994/44]
English:Data communications outlet kit[1994/44]
French:Assortiment de pièces d'une prise de communication de données[1994/44]
Examination procedure20.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/51]
02.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1999Fee for grant paid
11.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH15.03.2000
ES15.03.2000
IT15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
DK15.06.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2003/45]CH15.03.2000
ES15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
DK15.06.2000
Former [2003/08]CH15.03.2000
ES15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
Former [2002/26]CH15.03.2000
ES15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
Former [2002/23]CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
Former [2000/52]CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2513822  (SICILIANI EMILIO SPA [IT]);
 [A]EP0470011  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]);
 [A]DE1465312  (BURNDY CORP);
 [A]US4721482  (FUKUDA KIYOHITO [JP], et al)