EP0624349 - Device for tamponade in and maintenance of bony body cavities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milewski, Christian, Dr. med. Birkentalstrasse 39 D-97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | [1994/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/46] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107029.4 | 05.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | DE19934315821 | 12.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315821 | [1994/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624349 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624349 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/58, A61B17/24, A61B17/12 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/12022 (EP);
A61B17/12104 (EP);
A61B17/12136 (EP);
A61B17/24 (EP);
A61M25/1002 (EP);
A61B2017/00539 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Tamponade und zum Offenhalten von knochenbegrenzten Körperhöhlen | [1997/05] | English: | Device for tamponade in and maintenance of bony body cavities | [1994/46] | French: | Dispositif de tamponnement et de maintenir des cavités osseuses corporelles | [1994/46] |
Former [1994/46] | Vorrichtung zur Tamponade und zum Offenhalten von Knochenbegrenzten Körperhöhlen | Examination procedure | 12.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.01.1997 | GB | 29.01.1997 | IT | 29.01.1997 | NL | 29.01.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | GB | 29.01.1997 | |
IT | 29.01.1997 | ||
NL | 29.01.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 29.01.1997 | |
IT | 29.01.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 29.01.1997 | |
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | FR | 27.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE3736604 (MILEWSKI CHRISTIAN DR MED [DE]) [DX] 1-6,10,12 * the whole document *; | [XA]AT384945B (LIXL GEORG [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 8,9; | [X]US3800788 (WHITE N) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0057597 (OEC EUROP LTD [GB]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0141589 (RANGASWAMY AVVARI) |