Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0614171

EP0614171 - Signal processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/36]Voice signal processing device
[1999/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1994/36]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kane, Joji
4-34, Jingu 1-chome
Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP
02 / Nohara, Akira
10-17, Matsuzonocho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP
[1994/36]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstraße 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/36]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date94107071.618.01.1991
[1994/36]
Priority number, dateJP1990000859218.01.1990         Original published format: JP 859290
JP1990000859518.01.1990         Original published format: JP 859590
JP1990001734826.01.1990         Original published format: JP 1734890
JP1990002650606.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2650690
JP1990002650706.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2650790
JP1990003429714.02.1990         Original published format: JP 3429790
[1994/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0614171
Date:07.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0614171
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:G10L11/06
[2000/17]
Former International [1994/36]G10L3/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/36]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung eines Signals[1999/47]
English:Signal processing device[1999/47]
French:Dispositif de traitement d'un signal[1999/47]
Former [1994/36]Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung eines Sprachsignals
Former [1994/36]Voice signal processing device
Former [1994/36]Dispositif de traitement d'un signal de parole
Examination procedure19.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
16.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2000Fee for grant paid
03.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91100598.1  / EP0439073
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US4239936  (SAKOE HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 56 - column 7, line 53; figures 7-9 *;
 [A]WO8807739  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 5-7 *
 [A]  A. M. NOLL, "Cepstrum pitch determination", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (1967), vol. 41, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1121/1.1910339, pages 293 - 309, XP000579956 [A] 1-3 * page 295 - page 297 * * page 303 - page 305; figure 14 * * page 307 - page 309 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1910339
 [A]  M. TIMME, "Auswertung von Echtzeit-Cepstra zur schnellen Detektion stimmhafter Laute", NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, BERLIN, DE, (197307), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 312 - 316, [A] 1-3 * page 313, column L, line 46 - page 316 *