blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0628454

EP0628454 - Seat belt retractor for vehicle safety belt systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH
Industriestrasse 20
73553 Alfdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/04]For all designated states
TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH
Industriestrasse 20
D-73553 Alfdorf / DE
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
TRW REPA GMBH
Industriestrasse 20
D-73551 Alfdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmid, Johannes
Hauptstrasse 124
D-73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd-Hussenhofen / DE
02 / Mödinger, Thomas
Birkenweg 15
D-73553 Alfdorf-Vordersteinenberg / DE
[1994/50]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut, et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/50]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date94107210.009.05.1994
[1994/50]
Priority number, dateDE1993431927309.06.1993         Original published format: DE 4319273
[1994/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0628454
Date:14.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0628454
Date:19.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1994
ClassificationIPC:B60R22/46
[1994/50]
CPC:
B60R22/4628 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1994/50]
TitleGerman:Gurtaufroller für Fahrzeugsicherheitsgurtsysteme[1994/50]
English:Seat belt retractor for vehicle safety belt systems[1994/50]
French:Enrouleur de ceinture pour systèmes de ceinture de sécurité pour véhicules[1994/50]
Examination procedure05.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/10]
15.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.1996Fee for grant paid
20.11.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.12.1997  13.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Köster, Gerhard
Nordweg 8
87764 Legau / DE
Opponent's representative
Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bräuhausstrasse 2
80331 München / DE
 02  18.12.1997  19.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
HS Technik und Design Technische Entwicklungen GmbH
Argelsrieder Feld 10
82234 Wessling / DE
Opponent's representative
Nöth, Heinz
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/44]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.1997  13.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Köster, Gerhard
Nordweg 8
87764 Legau / DE
Opponent's representative
Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2
80331 München / DE
 02  18.12.1997  19.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
HS Technik und Design Technische Entwicklungen GmbH
Argelsrieder Feld 10
82234 Wessling / DE
Opponent's representative
Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Arnulfstrasse 25
80335 München / DE
Former [2002/01]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.1997  13.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Köster, Gerhard
Nordweg 8
87764 Legau / DE
Opponent's representative
Klingseisen, Franz
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4
80331 München / DE
 02  18.12.1997  19.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
HS Technik und Design Technische Entwicklungen GmbH
Argelsrieder Feld 10
82234 Wessling / DE
Opponent's representative
Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Arnulfstrasse 25
80335 München / DE
Former [1998/09]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.1997  13.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Köster, Gerhard
Nordweg 8
87764 Legau / DE
Opponent's representative
Klingseisen, Franz
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4
80331 München / DE
 02  18.12.1997  19.01.1998  ADMISSIBLE
HS Technik und Design Technische Entwicklungen GmbH
Argelsrieder Feld 10
82234 Wessling / DE
Opponent's representative
Nöth, Heinz
Patentanwälte Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
22.01.1998Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.04.1999Date of oral proceedings
27.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.10.2002Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/39]
23.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition18.06.1999Appeal received No.  T0637/99
31.08.1999Statement of grounds filed
17.05.2000Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [2000/21]
11.10.2001Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE10.05.1998
[1999/32]
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO8700809  (ALLIED ENG [LU]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 13 - line 31 * * page 12, line 38 - page 15, line 29 * [A] 2,8;
 [X]DE9217298U  (TAKATA CORP.) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 5 * * figure - *;
 [PX]EP0581288  (TAKATA EUROP GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * figures 1-5 * * abstract * * column 6, line 33 - column 9, line 24 *;
 [A]GB2237978  (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - * * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 17, line 10 *;
 [A]JPS6099741  ;
 [A]JPH03200454  ;
 [A]JPS60240549  ;
 [A]DE2505626  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1 * figure . * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 28 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851005), vol. 9, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 419)<1972> , & JP60099741 A 19850603 (NIPPON JIDOSHA BUHIN SOGO KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911127), vol. 15, no. 468, Database accession no. (M - 1184), & JP03200454 A 19910902 (TAKATA K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860423), vol. 10, no. 109, Database accession no. (M - 472), & JP60240549 A 19851129 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.