Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0628454 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0628454



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 365
27.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
24.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
26.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2002 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
20.11.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
19.11.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
19.11.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.09.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
23.09.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
17.09.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.09.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.09.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.08.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.04.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.04.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
19.04.2002 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
19.04.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.04.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.04.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.12.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.12.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.12.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.11.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.10.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.10.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
11.10.2001 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
21.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.02.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.02.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.02.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.02.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.02.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
15.02.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.06.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2000 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
20.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.12.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
14.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
31.08.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.08.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
02.07.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.07.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.06.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
27.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
27.04.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
27.04.1999 Means of redress Opposition 1
15.04.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
09.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.03.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.03.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.03.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.03.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
03.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.01.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.01.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.01.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.01.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
15.01.1999 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
04.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.11.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.09.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.09.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.05.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
22.01.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.01.1998 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.01.1998 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.12.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.12.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.12.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
18.12.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
06.02.1997 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.11.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.11.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.11.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.09.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.09.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.09.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
03.09.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
23.08.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.06.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
14.06.1996 Description Search / examination 3
14.06.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.02.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.12.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
28.11.1995 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
07.10.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.10.1994 European search report Search / examination 3
09.05.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.05.1994 Authorisation Search / examination 1
09.05.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.1994 Description Search / examination 5
09.05.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.1994 Drawings Search / examination 4
09.05.1994 Priority document Search / examination 14
09.05.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6