Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629013

EP0629013 - Device for supplying air to a fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/50]Method and device for supplying air to a fuel cell system
[1999/23]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.11.1999
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.1999Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DBB Fuel Cell Engines GmbH
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE
[2000/01]
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
DBB Fuel Cell Engines Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
D-70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fleck, Wolfram
Panoramaweg 12
D-89155 Erbach / DE
[1994/50]
Representative(s)Kocher, Klaus-Peter
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/S - C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Kocher, Klaus-Peter
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/S - C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date94107591.317.05.1994
[1994/50]
Priority number, dateDE1993431881807.06.1993         Original published format: DE 4318818
[1994/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0629013
Date:14.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0629013
Date:29.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0629013
Date:02.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/14]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0629013
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, B60L11/18
[1995/47]
Former International [1994/50]H01M8/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/50]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Luftversorgung eines Brennstoffzellensystems[1999/23]
English:Device for supplying air to a fuel cell system[1999/23]
French:Dispositif pour l'alimentation en air d'un système de piles à combustible[1999/23]
Former [1994/50]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luftversorgung eines Brennstoffzellensystems
Former [1994/50]Method and device for supplying air to a fuel cell system
Former [1994/50]Procédé et dispositif pour l'alimentation en air d'un système de piles à combustible
Examination procedure02.11.1995Examination requested  [1995/52]
02.08.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1996Fee for grant paid
19.10.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.1997   
Siemens AG Zentralabteilung Technik ZT PA Z
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [1998/10]
18.02.1998Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.03.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
23.04.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.08.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.10.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0419964  ;
 [A]JPS58166671  ;
 [A]JPS6332868  ;
 [A]JPH04342961  ;
 [A]FR1436747  (GAZ DE FRANCE) [A] 3,6 * page 2, column L, paragraph L; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS60160573  ;
 [A]US4923768  (KANEKO HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] * column 5, line 45 - line 50; figures 1,4; claims 1,8 *;
 [DA]WO9200614  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920427), vol. 016, no. 174, Database accession no. (E - 1195), & JP04019964 A 19920123 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831227), vol. 007, no. 292, Database accession no. (E - 219), & JP58166671 A 19831001 (KANSAI DENRIYOKU KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880709), vol. 012, no. 244, Database accession no. (E - 631), & JP63032868 A 19880212 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930419), vol. 017, no. 199, Database accession no. (E - 1352), & JP04342961 A 19921130 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 3,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851224), vol. 009, no. 328, Database accession no. (E - 369), & JP60160573 A 19850822 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] * abstract *
ExaminationDE3507095
 DE3531296
 US3972731
 US5083425
 DE3304605
 DE4021097