Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0626799

EP0626799 - Process for operating a high pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.1999
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.1999 [1999/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [1994/48]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
D-81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fromm, Dietrich, Dr.
Austrasse 7
D-83627 Warngau / DE
02 / Seehawer, Jürgen
Mauthäuslstrasse 33
D-81379 München / DE
03 / Bernitz, Franz
Ferdinand Lasallestrasse 9
D-82008 Unterhaching / DE
[1994/48]
Application number, filing date94107645.717.05.1994
[1994/48]
Priority number, dateDE1993431736825.05.1993         Original published format: DE 4317368
[1994/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0626799
Date:30.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0626799
Date:01.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0626799
Date:18.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/29
[1994/48]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Hochdruckentladungslampe[1994/48]
English:Process for operating a high pressure discharge lamp[1994/48]
French:Procédé pour commander une lampe à décharge haute pression[1994/48]
Examination procedure21.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/20]
11.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.1997Fee for grant paid
04.12.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0502273  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4109344  (UNIV BERLIN HUMBOLDT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 42 *;
 [A]EP0399288  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0386990  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1;
 [D]US5121034  (ALLEN GARY R [US], et al) [D] * column A *
 [A]  RUTAN & AL., "practical application of pulsed high pressure sodium lamp technology", JOURNAL OF THE ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING SOCIETY, NEW YORK US, (199212), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 60 - 68, XP000315313 [A] 1 * page 62, column R, line 26 - page 63, column L, line 23 *