EP0640688 - Ribozymes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gene Shears Pty Limited Administration Building CNR Barry Drive-Clunies Ross Street GPO Box 1600 Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states Gene Shears Pty Limited Administration Building CNR Barry Drive-Clunies Ross Street GPO Box 1600 Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU | ||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Gene Shears Pty Limited Suite 1, Building 5, 105 Delhi Road North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states GENE SHEARS PTY. LIMITED c/o Macphillamy Cummins & Gibson 10th Floor, National Mutual Centre Darwin Place Canberra City / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerlach, Wayne Lyle 22 Goble Street, Hughes Australian Capital Territory, 2605 / AU | 02 /
Haseloff, James Phillip 17 Hemmant Street, O'Connor Australian Capital Territory, 2601 / AU | 03 /
Jennings, Philip Anthony 13 Lobelia Street, West Chatswood New South Wales, 2066 / AU | 04 /
Cameron, Fiona Helen No.2 Rounce Avenue, Forestville New South Wales, 2087 / AU | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Almond-Martin, Carol, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Almond-Martin, Carol, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A., 62 rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1997/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1995/09] | Feiler, Lothar (DE) Patentanwälte Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107862.8 | 14.12.1988 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | AU1987PI05911 | 15.12.1987 Original published format: AU PI591187 | AU1988PI09950 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: AU PI995088 | AU1988PJ00353 | 09.09.1988 Original published format: AU PJ035388 | AU1988PJ01304 | 04.11.1988 Original published format: AU PJ130488 | AU1988PJ01333 | 07.11.1988 Original published format: AU PJ133388 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640688 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N9/00, C07H21/02, A61K31/70 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,KR,US);
A01N57/16 (EP);
A01N63/00 (KR);
A01N63/60 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C12N15/8218 (EP,KR);
C12N2310/12 (EP,KR);
C12N2310/121 (EP);
C12N2310/124 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | Ribozyme | [1995/09] | English: | Ribozymes | [1995/09] | French: | Ribozymes | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 16.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88311816.8 / EP0321201 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - UHLENBECK, O.C., "A small catalytic oligoribonucleotide", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19870813), vol. 328, pages 596 - 600, XP002755436 [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * the whole article, and especially figure 1a * | [DA] - FORSTER, A. & SYMONS, R., "Self-cleavage of virusoid RNA is performed by the proposed 55-nucleotide active site", CELL, CAMBRIDGE, NA US, (19870703), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(87)90657-X, pages 9 - 16, XP024245033 [DA] 1 * the whole article, and especially figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(87)90657-X | [DA] - FORSTER, A. & SYMONS, R., "Self-cleavage of plus and minus RNAs of a virusoid and a structural model for the active sites", CELL, CAMBRIDGE, NA US, (19870424), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(87)90562-9, pages 211 - 220, XP023884042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(87)90562-9 | [PX] - HASELOFF, J. & GERLACH, W., "Simple RNA enzymes with new and highly specific endoribonuclease activities", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19880818), vol. 334, doi:doi:10.1038/334585a0, pages 585 - 591, XP002029776 [PX] 1-4,6,8,9,15-17,30 * page 587, column R, line 23 - page 591 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/334585a0 | [PX] - WALBOT, V. & BRUENING, G., "Plant development and ribozymes for pathogens", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19880721), vol. 334, pages 196 - 197 [PX] 1-4 * page 197 * |