blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0631296

EP0631296 - Flat type picture display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.10.1997 [1997/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/52]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakatani, Toshifumi
19-13-1117, Sata-nakamachi 4-chome
Moriguchi City, 570 / JP
02 / Imai, Kanji
28-10, Noda 3-chome
Takatsuki City, 569 / JP
03 / Sekiguchi, Tomohiro
13-17, Motoyama-minamimachi 2-chome
Higashinada-ku, Kobe City 658 / JP
[1994/52]
Representative(s)Jung, Elisabeth
Jung HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/52]Jung, Elisabeth, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dr. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68
D-80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date94107967.524.05.1994
[1994/52]
Priority number, dateJP1993018603828.07.1993         Original published format: JP 18603893
JP1993012392726.05.1993         Original published format: JP 12392793
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0631296
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0631296
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:H01J31/12
[1994/52]
CPC:
H01J31/126 (EP,US); H01J29/02 (EP,US); H01J2329/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/52]
TitleGerman:Apparat für Flachbildwiedergabe[1996/42]
English:Flat type picture display apparatus[1994/52]
French:Dispositif de reproduction d'images du type à panneau[1994/52]
Former [1994/52]Apparatus für Flachbildwiedergabe
Examination procedure24.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/52]
10.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.1996Fee for grant paid
03.06.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0316871  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9;
 [A]EP0487936  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9;
 [A]US5003219  (MURAGISHI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9;
 [A]JPH0261948  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.