Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0639538

EP0639538 - Method of forming a permanently elastic adhesive bond, which is easily detachable in case of demounting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  NL  AT  LI 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  NL  AT  LI 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
Former [1995/08]For:CH  DE  ES  FR  IT  LI  NL  AT 
Schott Glaswerke
Hattenbergstrasse 10
D-55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE
Hattenbergstrasse 10
D-55122 Mainz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schultheis, Bernd
Silvaner Weg 2
D-55270 Schwabenheim / DE
02 / Hubert, Stefan
Weedestrasse 29a
D-55270 Bubenheim / DE
03 / Leroux, Roland, Dr.
Spielbergstrasse 49a
D-55271 Stadecken-Elsheim / DE
04 / Thürk, Jürgen, Dr.
Höllenwegstrasse 2
D-55288 Schornsheim / DE
05 / Schaupert, Kurt, Dr.
Rüdesheimer Strasse 46
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
06 / Noky, Werner
Philipp-Wasserburgstrasse 32
D-55122 Mainz / DE
[1995/08]
Application number, filing date94108764.508.06.1994
[1995/08]
Priority number, dateDE1993432747516.08.1993         Original published format: DE 4327475
[1995/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0639538
Date:22.02.1995
Language:DE
[1995/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0639538
Date:04.06.1997
[1997/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0639538
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:C03C27/10, F24C15/10
[1997/21]
Former International [1995/08]C03C27/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ausbildung einer dauerelastischen, im Demontagefall leicht lösbaren Klebeverbindung[1995/08]
English:Method of forming a permanently elastic adhesive bond, which is easily detachable in case of demounting[1995/08]
French:Méthode pour la formation d'un collage d'élasticité permanente et détachable en cas de démontage[1995/08]
Examination procedure01.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/35]
26.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1999Fee for grant paid
12.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3501490  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3124138  (VER GLASWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * figures 2,6; claim - *;
 [DX]DE3104114  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [DX] 1 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [E]DE4318854  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [E] 1-3,5,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP0640797  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [E] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 37 * * claim - *;
 [A]EP0081426  (BOUSSOIS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]GB2102938  (ZEISS STIFTUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [D]DE3126013  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]);
 [DA]DE2819118  (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN) [DA] 1 * the whole document *