Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0640543

EP0640543 - Winding device for a web of fibrous material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[1999/02]
Former [1995/19]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH
Postfach 19 70
D-89509 Heidenheim / DE
Former [1995/09]For all designated states
SULZER-ESCHER WYSS GMBH
Postfach 13 80
D-88183 Ravensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dahl, Hans, Dr.
Karl-Erb-Ring 89
D-88213 Ravensburg / DE
[1995/09]
Application number, filing date94109260.316.06.1994
[1995/09]
Priority number, dateDE1993432831023.08.1993         Original published format: DE 4328310
[1995/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0640543
Date:01.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0640543
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:B65H18/16, B65H20/10, D21G9/00
[1995/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   GB,   SE [1995/09]
TitleGerman:Aufwickelvorrichtung für eine Faserstoffbahn[1995/09]
English:Winding device for a web of fibrous material[1995/09]
French:Dispositif d'enroulement pour une bande de matière fibreuse[1995/09]
Examination procedure16.06.1994Examination requested  [1995/09]
24.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.1999Fee for grant paid
18.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98122861.2  / EP0915046
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB09.02.2000
[2001/12]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US1585977  (HALL EDWARD M) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * * page 3, line 1 - line 55 * [Y] 2,6;
 [YA]DE3344217  (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [Y] 2,6 * figure 1 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 21 * [A] 1;
 [XY]US2020118  (KELLETT WILLIAM R, et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * page 1, column L, line 32 - line 46 * [Y] 3,4,6,7;
 [YA]DE9208419U  (J.M. VOITH GMBH) [Y] 3,6,7 * figure 4 * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 2 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 19 * [A] 2;
 [YA]GB2226304  (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 12 - line 24 * [A] 1;
 [A]US4429819  (PALOVAARA JAAKKO [FI]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 22 - line 23 *;
 [A]US3515183  (VOSS WILLIAM KENNETH) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3400939  (VALMET OY [FI]) [A] 2 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2007211  (SANTA LUCIA SAS)