Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0633576

EP0633576 - Semiconductor integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-2-3, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/02]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-2-3, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Atsuo, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
Kitaitami Seisakusho, 1 Mizuhara 4-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP
[1995/02]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/02]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date94110235.230.06.1994
[1995/02]
Priority number, dateJP1993016567205.07.1993         Original published format: JP 16567293
[1995/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0633576
Date:11.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0633576
Date:14.01.1998
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0633576
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/06
[1995/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/02]
TitleGerman:Integrierte Halbleiterschaltung[1995/02]
English:Semiconductor integrated circuit[1995/02]
French:Circuit intégré à semi-conducteur[1995/02]
Examination procedure17.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/16]
22.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2000Fee for grant paid
10.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2144006  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-3 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 59; figures 3,4,6 *;
 [Y]EP0450797  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 4 - line 53; figure 1A *;
 [YA]EP0370529  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 49; figure 2 * [A] 1-3;
 [Y]US4628487  (SMAYLING MICHAEL C [US]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 58; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US4733371  (TERADA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column W *