Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0655359

EP0655359 - Sun visor for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.1998
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.02.1998 [1998/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BECKER GROUP EUROPE GmbH
Konsumstrasse 45
42285 Wuppertal / DE
[1996/44]
Former [1995/22]For all designated states
GEBR. HAPPICH GmbH
Konsumstrasse 45
D-42285 Wuppertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Viertel, Lothar
Lilienstr. 4
D-66802 Altforweiler / DE
02 / Welter, Patrick
Rue Principal 12
F-57730 La Chambre / FR
[1995/22]
Application number, filing date94112322.606.08.1994
[1995/22]
Priority number, dateDE1993434068530.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4340685
[1995/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0655359
Date:31.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0655359
Date:05.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:B60J3/00
[1995/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/22]
TitleGerman:Sonnenblende für Fahrzeuge[1995/22]
English:Sun visor for vehicles[1995/22]
French:Pare-soleil pour véhicules[1995/22]
Examination procedure07.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/22]
13.08.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.09.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1996Fee for grant paid
25.11.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3324169  (ZIPPERLE) [A] 1;
 [A]US5022699  (YOSHIDA YOSHIHIDE [JP]) [A] 1;
 [A]US4796944  (LOBANOFF) [A] 1;
 [A]US5067764  (LANSER) [A] 1;
 [A]US5005895  (MUYRES) [A] 1;
 [DA]EP0266327  (AUTOPART) [DA] 1