blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0631158

EP0631158 - Method for forming distributed bragg reflectors with spezially varying amplitude in optical media [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.1997Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.01.1998 [1998/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1994/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Mizrahi, Victor
412 Cardinal Lane
Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US
02 / Mollenauer, Linn Frederick
11 Carriage Hill Drive
Colts Neck, New Jersey 07722 / US
[1994/52]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/52]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al
AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date94112336.603.12.1993
[1994/52]
Priority number, dateUS1992099549223.12.1992         Original published format: US 995492
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0631158
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/16, G02B6/12
[1994/52]
CPC:
C03C13/045 (EP,US); C03C25/6208 (EP,US); C03C25/6226 (EP,US);
G02B6/02133 (EP,US); G02B6/02138 (EP,US); G02B6/124 (EP,US);
H01S3/094003 (EP,US); C03B2201/34 (EP,US); C03B2203/18 (EP,US);
G02B6/0208 (EP,US); G02B6/02085 (EP,US); G02B6/02152 (EP,US);
H01S3/0675 (EP,US); H01S3/094015 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/52]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Herstellung eines verteilten Bragg-Reflektors mit räumlich veränderlicher Amplitude in optischen Medien[1994/52]
English:Method for forming distributed bragg reflectors with spezially varying amplitude in optical media[1994/52]
French:Méthode de fabrication des réflecteurs de Bragg distribués avec variation spatiale l'amplitude dans un milieu optique[1994/52]
Examination procedure18.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/52]
21.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.1997Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1998/05]
29.08.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1998/05]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93309689.3  / EP0604039
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4093338  (BJORKLUND GARY CARL, et al) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 24 - line 54; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPS61262717  ;
 [A]WO9207289  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5104209  (HILL KENNETH O [CA], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 29; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH03246510
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870411), vol. 11, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 566), & JP61262717 A 19861120 (RICOH) [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920130), vol. 16, no. 39, Database accession no. (P - 1305), & JP03246510 A 19911101 (SHARP) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.