EP0643079 - Process for the preparation of elastomeric copolymers of ethylene and products obtained therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL | [2000/43] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states Montell Technology Company bv Hoeksteen 66 NL-2132 MS Hoofddorp / NL | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states SPHERILENE S.p.A. Foro Buonaparte 31 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states SPHERILENE S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galimberti, Maurizio Via Vertoiba 4 I-20137 Milano / IT | 02 /
Albizzati, Enrico Via Roma 64 I-28041 Arona (NO) / IT | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property P.le G. Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Zanoli, Enrico Spherilene S.p.A. Via Taramelli 26/28 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94113512.1 | 29.08.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | IT1993MI01963 | 13.09.1993 Original published format: IT MI931963 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0643079 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0643079 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643079 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/18, C08F210/16, C08F4/622 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C08F210/18 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/06 (KR);
C08F4/63908 (KR);
C08F4/63912 (KR);
C08F4/63927 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/14 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F210/08, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/20, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/21 (US,EP);
C08F210/18, C08F2500/21 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/11] | C08F210/18, C08F4/622 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [2000/13] |
Former [1995/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von elastomeren Copolymeren des Ethylens und daraus erhaltene Produkte | [1995/11] | English: | Process for the preparation of elastomeric copolymers of ethylene and products obtained therefrom | [1995/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation de copolymères élastomères d'éthylène et produits ainsi obtenus | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0223394 (UNIROYAL CHEM CO INC [US]) [A] 1-5* example -; claim - *; | [XY]EP0277004 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1 * example 32; claim - * [Y] 1-5; | [A]EP0347129 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 50 - page 9, line 19; example 6; claim - *; | [A]EP0512741 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0552945 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9319107 (SPHERILENE SRL [IT]) [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0347128 | EP0535230 |