Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0642155
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.03.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
23.03.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] |
17.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.09.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.09.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.09.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.09.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.1996 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.02.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
20.01.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |