blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0642155

EP0642155 - Method of manufacturing semiconductor capacitor electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toshiyuki, Hirota, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1995/10]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/10]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date94113762.202.09.1994
[1995/10]
Priority number, dateJP1993021937003.09.1993         Original published format: JP 21937093
[1995/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0642155
Date:08.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0642155
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1994
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/3205, H01L27/108
[1995/10]
CPC:
H01L21/32134 (EP,US); H10D1/712 (EP,KR,US); H10B12/01 (EP,US);
Y10S438/964 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiter-Kondensator-Elektrode[1995/10]
English:Method of manufacturing semiconductor capacitor electrode[1995/10]
French:Procédé de manufacture d'une élctrode de condensateur semi-conducteur[1995/10]
Examination procedure27.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/13]
18.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2001Fee for grant paid
03.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04365369  ;
 [X]EP0553791  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [X]EP0557590  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [PX]EP0572943  (IBM [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.