Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0647711

EP0647711 - Plants transformed with a DNA sequence from bacillus thuringiensis lethal to lepidoptera [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer BioScience N.V.
Jozef Plateaustraat 22
9000 Gent / BE
[2003/01]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Aventis CropScience N.V.
Jozef Plateaustraat 22
9000 Gent / BE
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Aventis Cropscience N.V.
Jozef Plateaustraat 22
9000 Gent / BE
Former [1995/15]For all designated states
PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS, N.V.
Kolonel Bourgstraat 106 Bus 6
B-1040 Brussel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Botterman, Johan
Het Wijngaardcke 5
B-9721 Zevergem-de Pinte / BE
02 / Peferoen, Marnix
Berkenlaan 7
B-9850 Nevele / BE
03 / Hofte, Herman
Caminito Ameco 68
92037 La Jolia, California / US
04 / Joos, Henk
Oostmolen Zuid 5
B-9880 Aalter / BE
 [2003/22]
Former [1995/17]01 / Botterman, Johan
Het Wijngaardcke 5
B-9721 Zevergem-de Pinte / BE
02 / Peferoen, Marnix
Berkenlaan 7
B-9850 Nevele / BE
03 / Hofte, Herman
Caminito Ameco 68
92037 La Jolia, California / US
04 / Joos, Henk
Oostmolen Zuid 5
B-9880 Allter / BE
Former [1995/15]01 / Botterman, Johan
Het Wijngaardcke 5
B-9721 Zevergem-de Pinte / BE
02 / Peferoen, Marnix
Mincklerstraat 129
B-3000 Leuven / BE
03 / Hofte, Herman
Caminito Ameco 68
92037 La Jolia, California / US
04 / Joos, Henk
Oostmolen Zuid 5
B-9880 Allter / BE
Representative(s)Meulemans, Wouter L.J.
Bayer BioScience N.V.
BioScience IP Department
Technologiepark 38
9052 Gent / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Meulemans, Wouter L. J.
Bayer BioScience N.V. Intellectual Property Department Jozef Plateaustraat 22
9000 Gent / BE
Former [1995/15]Desaix, Anne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94114386.904.09.1989
[1995/15]
Priority number, dateEP1988040224106.09.1988         Original published format: EP 88402241
EP1989040150031.05.1989         Original published format: EP 89401500
[1995/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0647711
Date:12.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0647711
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/32, C12N15/82, C07K14/325, C12N5/10, A01H5/00, A01N63/02
[1995/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1995/15]
TitleGerman:Pflanzen, die mit einer lepidopter-lethalen DNS-Sequenz aus Bazillus thuringiensis transformiert werden[1995/15]
English:Plants transformed with a DNA sequence from bacillus thuringiensis lethal to lepidoptera[1995/15]
French:Plantes transformées par une séquence d'ADN, léthale pour les lépidoptéra, de bacillus thuringiensis[1995/15]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure05.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/15]
12.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2003Fee for grant paid
13.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP89402403.3  / EP0358557
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
18.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
22.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 12
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 13
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
IT04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GB04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
LU04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]AT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GB04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
LU04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/45]AT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GB04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
LU04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/39]AT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
LU04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/28]AT04.06.2003
BE04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/23]AT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
DE05.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
Former [2004/01]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0193259  (PGS) [X] 3-11,14 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0295156  (INSTITUT PASTEUR) [PX] 1-16,19,20 * see whole document particularly claims 28 and 33-36 *;
 [PX]EP0305375  (PGS) [PX] 12 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0206613  (REPLIGEN) [A] 12 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 14 * * page 23, chart B; claims 3-5, 14 *;
 [A]EP0256553  (SUMITOMO);
 [A]EP0224331  (SUMITOMO)
 [DX]  - HONÉE, G., ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of crystal protein gene isolated from B.thuringiensis subspecies entomocidus 60.5 coding for a toxin highly active against spodoptera species", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US, (19880711), vol. 16, no. 13, page 6240 [DX] 1,2,11,15,16,18 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - BRIZZARD, B.L., ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of an additional crystal protein gene cloned from Bacillus thuringiensis subsp. thuringiensis", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US, (19880325), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 2723 - 2724, XP000941410 [DX] 1,15,16,18 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SANCHIS, V., ET AL., "Multiplicity of delta-endotoxin genes with different insecticidal specificities in Bacillus thuringiensis aizawai 7.29", MOL. MICROBIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 393 - 404 [X] 1,2,11,15,16,18-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - VISSER, B., ET AL., "Genes from Bacillus thuringiensis entomocidus 60.5 coding for insect-specific crystal proteins", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880815), vol. 109, no. 7, Database accession no. 49303 [X] 1,2,11,15,16 * abstract *
    [ ] - MOL. GEN. GENET., (1988), vol. 212, no. 2, pages 219 - 224
 [X]  - VAECK, M., ET AL., "Transgenic plants protected from insect attack", NATURE, LONDON GB, (19870702), vol. 328, doi:doi:10.1038/328033a0, pages 33 - 37, XP002166163 [X] 3-11,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/328033a0
 [X]  - BARTON, K. A., ET AL., "Bacillus thuringiensis delta-endotoxin expressed in transgenic Nicotiana tabacum provides resistance to lepidopteran insects", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 85, pages 1103 - 1109, XP002166119 [X] 10 * page 1108, column R, paragraph 2 *
 [PX]  - HÖFTE, H. ET AL., "Insecticidal crystal proteins of Bacillus thuringiensis", MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (198907), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 242 - 255 [PX] 1,2 * table 2 *
 [A]  - PREFONTAINE, G., ET AL., "Use of oligonucleotide probes to study the relatedness of delta-endotoxin genes among Bacillus thuringiensis subspecies", APLLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (198712), vol. 53, no. 12, pages 2689 - 2698 [A] 13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HÖFTE, H., ET AL., "Structural and functional analysis of a cloned delta endotoxin of Bacillus thuringiensis berliner 1715", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 161, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1432-1033.1986.tb10443.x, XP000572684 [A] 12,19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1986.tb10443.x
 [A]  - HÖFTE, H., ET AL., "Fusion proteins with both insecticidal and neomycin phosphotransferase II activity", FEBS LETTERS, (198801), vol. 226, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(88)81455-8, pages 364 - 370, XP025605969 [A] 17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(88)81455-8