blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0647711 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0647711



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 588
07.04.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.2003 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
01.04.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
17.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
17.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 6
13.12.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
07.12.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.12.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.11.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.11.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
09.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
05.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
01.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 2
06.06.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.06.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.06.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
27.04.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
27.04.2001 Description Search / examination 30
27.04.2001 Description Search / examination 30
27.04.2001 Drawings Search / examination 22
27.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 58
19.12.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.12.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2000 Annex Search / examination 10
24.11.2000 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims Search / examination 3
24.11.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
22.11.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 19
21.09.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.09.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.05.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
19.04.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.04.2000 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 5
13.10.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
11.10.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
03.03.1995 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.1995 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.1995 European search report Search / examination 6
11.01.1995 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
29.12.1994 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.12.1994 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.12.1994 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 6
26.10.1994 Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material Search / examination 2
15.09.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
15.09.1994 Description Search / examination 30
15.09.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.1994 Drawings Search / examination 51
15.09.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
15.09.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
13.09.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.09.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
13.09.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
13.09.1994 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 87
28.09.1989 Priority document Search / examination 32
28.09.1989 Priority document Search / examination 36