Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0645127

EP0645127 - Hip prostheses extractor with sliding mass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1996
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Szabo, Zsolt
Reginoltstrasse 17
D-80933 München / DE
[1995/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Szabo, Zsolt
Reginoltstrasse 17
D-80993 München / DE
02 / Seeberger, Georg
Seestrasse 40
D-82396 Pähl / DE
[1996/03]
Former [1995/13]01 / Szabo, Zsolt
Feldmochinger Strasse 56
D-80993 München / DE
02 / Seeberger, Georg
Seestrasse 40
D-82396 Pähl / DE
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Former [1995/13]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
D-81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date94114466.914.09.1994
[1995/13]
Priority number, dateDE1993433287227.09.1993         Original published format: DE 4332872
[1995/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0645127
Date:29.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0645127
Date:17.01.1996
Language:DE
[1996/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[1995/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/34]
Former [1995/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ausschlagwerkzeug für Gelenkprothesen[1995/13]
English:Hip prostheses extractor with sliding mass[1995/13]
French:Outil à choc pour extraction d'une prothèse de hanche[1995/13]
Examination procedure29.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
29.03.1995Request for accelerated examination filed
07.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1995Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1995Fee for grant paid
11.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
ES17.01.1996
GR17.01.1996
IT17.01.1996
NL17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
IE15.08.1996
LU30.09.1996
[2003/08]
Former [2002/26]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
ES17.01.1996
GR17.01.1996
IT17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
IE15.08.1996
LU30.09.1996
Former [2002/10]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
GR17.01.1996
IT17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
IE15.08.1996
LU30.09.1996
Former [2000/05]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
GR17.01.1996
IE17.01.1996
IT17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
LU30.09.1996
Former [1999/42]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
IE17.01.1996
IT17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1999/16]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
IE17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1998/15]BE17.01.1996
DK17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1998/14]BE17.01.1996
PT17.04.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1996/51]BE17.01.1996
SE17.04.1996
Former [1996/38]SE17.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2627983  (VECTEUR ORTHOPEDIC) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4222382  (ANTONSSON) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2686016  (ICP FRANCE)