blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0644207

EP0644207 - Superabsorbent polymer having improved absorption rate and absorption under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STOCKHAUSEN LOUISIANA LIMITED
3606 Highway 44
Garyville, Louisiana 70051 / US
[1999/31]
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY
One Nalco Center
Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Scott J.
2465 Parkview Drive
Aurora, Illinois / US
02 / Lind, Eric J.
1520 Lark Lane
Naperville, Illinois / US
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Kahlhöfer, Hermann
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann
Rößler Heine PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Heilein Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/32]Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr., et al
Kutzenberger & Wolff, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [1996/51]Hartmann, Günter, et al
RUSCHKE HARTMANN BECKER, Patentanwälte, Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Former [1995/12]Ruschke, Olaf, et al
Pienzenauerstrasse 2
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date94114621.916.09.1994
[1995/12]
Priority number, dateUS1993012356117.09.1993         Original published format: US 123561
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0644207
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0644207
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0644207
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1994
ClassificationIPC:C08F8/00, A61L15/00
[1995/12]
CPC:
A61F13/53 (EP,US); A61F13/15203 (EP,US); A61L15/60 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530656 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A61L15/60, A61L15/425 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/12]
TitleGerman:Superabsorbierendes Polymer mit verbesserten Absorbiereigenschaften und Absorption unter Druck[1995/12]
English:Superabsorbent polymer having improved absorption rate and absorption under pressure[1995/12]
French:Polymère superabsorbant de pouvoir absorbant perfectionné et d'absorption sous pression améliorée[1995/12]
Examination procedure23.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
11.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1996Fee for grant paid
01.10.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.10.1997  15.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kinzebach, Werner, et al, et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1997/49]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.1997  15.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kinzebach, Werner, et al, et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
11.11.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
20.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.03.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
21.07.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.08.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.08.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.12.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.02.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.06.1999Appeal received No.  T0641/99
30.08.1999Statement of grounds filed
16.07.2002Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0248437  (HAYASHIKANE SHIPBUILDING & ENG [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 *;
 [Y]EP0317106  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-28 * page 3, line 17 - line 55 * * page 4, line 27 - line 43; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0450923  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 45; claims 1-30 *;
 [DY]US5118719  (LIND ERIC J [US]) [DY] 1-28;
 [Y]EP0509708  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-28 * claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP0538983  (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-28 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 41; claims 1-12 *;
 [PX]US5338766  (PHAN DEAN V [US], et al) [PX] 1 * column 6, line 46 - column 9, line 31 ** column 11, line 21 - column 12, line 26; claims 1-14 *
OppositionEP0248963
 DE4020780
 EP0450924
 WO9502002
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.