Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0644207 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0644207



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 764
23.03.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.02.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Claims Opposition 8
13.02.2004 Claims Opposition 8
13.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 8
03.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 8
16.12.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
16.12.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
16.12.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
09.12.2003 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
29.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.08.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
21.08.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.08.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
29.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.07.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
21.05.2003 Description Opposition 2
08.05.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.04.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.04.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.2003 Description Opposition 2
28.03.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
28.01.2003 Description Opposition 2
28.01.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.01.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.01.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.01.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
23.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.01.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.01.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.12.2002 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.2002 Claims Opposition 1
13.12.2002 Description Opposition 7
13.12.2002 Description Opposition 8
13.12.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.12.2002 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.10.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.10.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
09.10.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.10.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.10.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.07.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.07.2002 Claims Appeal 3
16.07.2002 Claims Appeal 3
16.07.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 46
16.07.2002 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
16.07.2002 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
11.07.2002 Authorisation Search / examination 1
11.07.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.07.2002 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Search / examination 2
25.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2002 Annex Search / examination 9
20.06.2002 Annex Search / examination 2
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
20.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 15
13.06.2002 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.03.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.03.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.03.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
08.03.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
06.09.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
14.08.2000 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
20.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.06.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.06.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
18.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.05.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
31.03.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.03.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.01.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.01.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.08.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
22.08.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.07.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.06.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
28.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.06.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.06.1999 Authorisation Opposition 1
23.06.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
23.06.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.06.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.06.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.06.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 2
17.06.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.06.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.05.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.05.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.04.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.04.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
20.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
20.04.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
14.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.01.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
05.01.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
02.10.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
08.09.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.09.1998 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 3
28.08.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.08.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.08.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
25.08.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.08.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
13.08.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
24.04.1998 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.10.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
01.10.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
01.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
06.03.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.12.1996 Authorisation Search / examination 1
11.12.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.11.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.10.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.09.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.09.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
11.09.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 9
04.07.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.06.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.05.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.05.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
30.05.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
01.04.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.03.1996 Description Search / examination 21
21.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.01.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.12.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.12.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.03.1995 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
11.10.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.10.1994 Priority document Search / examination 36
16.09.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 8
16.09.1994 Description Search / examination 22
16.09.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.06.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6