Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0644093

EP0644093 - Apparatus for controlling brake pressure to wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome
Kariya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome
Kariya City Aichi Pref. / JP
For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hattori, Noriaki
29-4, Hamakutekami, Yokoyama-cho
Anjou City, Aichi pref. / JP
02 / Tozu, Kenji
10, 5-chome, Sakura-machi
Kariya City, Aichi pref. / JP
03 / Mihara, Jun
1-1, 6-chome, Futamuradai
Toyoake City, Aichi pref. / JP
04 / Itoh, Takayuki
1, 2-chome, Nishishiro, Moriyama-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi pref. / JP
05 / Sugiura, Shingo
146, Shiromae, Izumida-cho
Kariya City, Aichi pref. / JP
06 / Yamazaki, Norio
18, 3-chome, Nakayama-cho
Kariya City, Aichi pref. / JP
07 / Inagaki, Shoji
1321-3107, Mishuku
Susono City, Shizuoka pref. / JP
08 / Yamamoto, Masaki
1-19-3, Chuo
Kakegawa City, Shizuoka pref. / JP
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date94114776.120.09.1994
[1995/12]
Priority number, dateJP1993023603322.09.1993         Original published format: JP 23603393
JP1993023701624.09.1993         Original published format: JP 23701693
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0644093
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0644093
Date:07.01.1998
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0644093
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/48, B60T8/26, B60T8/24
[1995/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1995/12]
TitleGerman:Radbremsdrucksteuergerät[1995/12]
English:Apparatus for controlling brake pressure to wheels[1995/12]
French:Dispositif de commande de la pression de freinage des roues[1995/12]
Examination procedure02.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
12.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2002Fee for grant paid
24.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US4778226  (BROWN GEORGE E [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 16; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE3630052  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [X]GB2197401  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 109 - page 2, line 68; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3611822  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 2,4,6-10 * page 11, paragraph L - page 18, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE3903709  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 2,4,6-10 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4010332  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 2,4,6-10 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 59; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3919347  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 2,4,6-10 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4208141  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 2,4,6-10 * abstract *