Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0645426 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0645426



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 670
11.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
05.04.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 48
17.02.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
17.01.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2006 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Search / examination 2
12.01.2006 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
11.01.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.01.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.01.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.11.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.10.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
04.10.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.04.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
15.04.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
27.07.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.07.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
15.07.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
29.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 8
21.04.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
02.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
19.12.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
28.11.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
21.11.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2003 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
13.09.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.09.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.05.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
30.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
29.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
28.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
20.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.03.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.03.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.02.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.02.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.02.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.12.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
20.12.2002 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
20.12.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.12.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
20.12.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
26.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
26.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.10.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.10.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.10.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 9
15.10.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 9
08.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.09.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.09.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.07.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.07.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
16.07.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.07.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.07.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.06.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
20.11.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
29.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.09.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.09.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.09.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.05.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.04.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.04.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.04.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.04.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.05.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.02.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
20.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.01.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
19.12.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.09.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
09.09.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
18.06.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.05.1998 Annex Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Annex Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Annex Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.04.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.1998 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.02.1998 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
21.11.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.09.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.09.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.07.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.12.1996 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.11.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.11.1996 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
15.11.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) Search / examination 1
08.11.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.11.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.09.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.09.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.09.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.04.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.01.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
21.09.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 5
21.09.1994 Description Search / examination 32
21.09.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.09.1994 Priority document Search / examination 34
21.09.1994 Priority document Search / examination 39
21.09.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6