blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0672773 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0672773



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 126
15.04.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
05.02.2002 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
05.02.2002 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
31.01.2002 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
06.12.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
27.11.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
27.11.2001 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 1
23.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.10.2001 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
16.10.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
13.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
02.02.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
12.12.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.12.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
04.10.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
04.10.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.07.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
27.05.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
28.04.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.10.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.10.1998 European search report Search / examination 2
20.10.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.10.1994 Priority document Search / examination 10
05.10.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.10.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
05.10.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
05.10.1994 Description Search / examination 5
05.10.1994 Description Search / examination 5
05.10.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5