blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0672773


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.02.2002 Opposition rejected published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
07.12.2001 Change - applicant published on  23.01.2002  [2002/04]
11.10.2001 Opposition rejected
07.02.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
07.12.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
21.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
13.10.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
21.10.1999 Renewal fee
05.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
01.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.1999 First examination report
11.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
11.12.1998 Request for examination filed published on  27.01.1999 [1999/04]
30.10.1998 Publication of search report published on  16.12.1998 [1998/51]
30.10.1998 Change - classification published on  16.12.1998 [1998/51]
16.10.1998 Renewal fee
17.10.1997 Renewal fee
17.10.1996 Renewal fee
04.08.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.09.1995 [1995/38]