blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0672773
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59409086D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE59409086 05.10.1994
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2956823BGlobal Dossier 04.10.1999B2
JPH0841760 13.02.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0672773Global Dossier 19.01.2000B1
EP0672773 16.12.1998A3
EP0672773 20.09.1995A2
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4408813 05.10.1995C1
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2142898T 01.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5552206 03.09.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9501499 07.12.1995B
Priority number Date
DE4408813 16.03.1994