blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0672773

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted19.01.2000
Opposition procedure26.10.2001Legal effect of rejection of opposition published on 20.03.2002 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.09.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:16.12.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:27.01.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981127
 
Event date:30.06.1999 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19990514
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:16.02.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.
 
Event date:24.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59409086
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000224
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:25.02.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20000313
 
Event date:01.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2142898 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:06.12.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES
Effective DATE:20001004
 
Event date:01.02.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, BUIRE COURCELLES
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:23.01.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:CARL FREUDENBERG KG
 
Event date:20.03.2002 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20011026
 
Event date:02.04.2002 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:CARL FREUDENBERG KG
 
Event date:03.06.2002 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
 
Event date:03.06.2002 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1
Owner Name:CARL FREUDENBERG KG
 
Event date:02.06.2003 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20011026
 
Event date:02.06.2003 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1
Owner Name:CARL FREUDENBERG KG
 
Event date:23.09.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20050923
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:06.10.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20051006
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:20.10.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20051020
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:25.10.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20051025
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.10.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20061031
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:01.05.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070501
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20061005
 
Event date:02.07.2007 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20070501
 
Event date:27.07.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20070629
 
Event date:24.11.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061005
 
Event date:16.01.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20061006
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061006
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20071005
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20121211
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:14.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59409086 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140501
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140501