Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0672773

EP0672773 - Single-layered nonwoven composite [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  01.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2002Opposition rejectedpublished on 20.03.2002  [2002/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2002/04]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Former [1995/38]For all designated states
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
D-69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knoke, Jürgen
Wintergasse 87
D-69469 Weinheim / DE
02 / Jöst, Manfred
Beethovenstrasse 8
D-69502 Hemsbach / DE
[1995/38]
Application number, filing date94115631.705.10.1994
[1995/38]
Priority number, dateDE1994440881316.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4408813
[1995/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0672773
Date:20.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0672773
Date:16.12.1998
[1998/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0672773
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/52, D04H1/44, D04H1/46, A41D27/06, D04H3/12
[1998/51]
Former International [1995/38]D04H1/52, D04H1/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/38]
TitleGerman:Einlagevliesverbundstoff[1995/38]
English:Single-layered nonwoven composite[1995/38]
French:Non-tissé composite d'une couche[1995/38]
Examination procedure27.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.1999Fee for grant paid
19.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.10.2000  17.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, Buire Courcelles
BP 89
F-80202 PERONNE Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Derambure, Christian
BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ
38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  04.10.2000  17.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
LAINIERE DE PICARDIE, Buire Courcelles
BP 89
F-80202 PERONNE Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Derambure, Christian
Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
12.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.02.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2001Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.10.2001Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4696850  (JOST MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0390579  (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0119754  (CROWN TEXTILE CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4116569  (KUFNER TEXTILWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *;
 [A]US5194320  (GROSHENS PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-7,15 *;
 [A]US4998421  (ZAFIROGLU DINITRI PETER [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *