Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0646539

EP0646539 - A Container Yoke [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elmhults Konstruktions AB
Box 174
S-343 00 Almhult / SE
[1995/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Karlsson, Gösta
Skogsgatan 6
S-280 72 Killeberg / SE
[1995/14]
Representative(s)Onn, Thorsten , et al
Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101
104 35 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1995/14]Onn, Thorsten , et al
AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA, Zacco & Bruhn, Box 23101
S-104 35 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date94115652.304.10.1994
[1995/14]
Priority number, dateSE1993000321901.10.1993         Original published format: SE 9303219
[1995/14]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0646539
Date:05.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0646539
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:B66C1/66
[1995/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/14]
TitleGerman:Tragrahmen für Container[1995/14]
English:A Container Yoke[1995/14]
French:Cadre de préhension de container[1995/14]
Examination procedure05.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/48]
01.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.1999Fee for grant paid
10.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8103323  (BACKTEMANS PATENTER AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2156685  (TOW MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,5 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 17 *;
 [PX]US5280980  (COATTA STEPHEN J J [CA]) [PX] 1 * column A; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]DE2239756  (KOCKS GMBH FRIEDRICH) [A] 8 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]DE2460137  (LAU ROBERT);
 [A]DE2752637  (PEINER MASCH SCHRAUBEN);
 [A]EP0173920  (PEINER MASCH SCHRAUBEN [DE])