Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0647940

EP0647940 - Disk player with secure magazine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/15]Changer-type disc playback device
[1998/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NAKAMICHI CORPORATION
No. 1-153, Suzuki-cho Kodaira-shi
Tokyo 187-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Nakamichi Corporation
No. 1-153, Suzuki-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8501 / JP
Former [1995/15]For all designated states
NAKAMICHI CORPORATION
No. 1-153, Suzuki-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamichi, Niro
22 Avenida de Cameria
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90274 / US
[1995/15]
Representative(s)Rauh, Helga
Merten & Pfeffer Patentverwaltung Allersberger Strasse 185
90461 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]Rauh, Helga
Wielandstrasse 4
90419 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/03]Rauh, Helga
Merten & Pfeffer, Patentverwaltung, Tristanstrasse 5
90461 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1998/26]Rauh, Helga
Wielandstrasse 4
90419 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1995/15]Merten, Fritz
Tristanstrasse 5
D-90461 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date94115654.905.10.1994
[1995/15]
Priority number, dateJP1993027310205.10.1993         Original published format: JP 27310293
[1995/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0647940
Date:12.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0647940
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/22
[1995/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/15]
TitleGerman:Plattenspieler mit Sicherheitsmagazin[1998/46]
English:Disk player with secure magazine[1998/46]
French:Lecteur de disques à magasin de sécurite[1998/46]
Former [1995/15]Als Plattenwechsler ausgebildetes Plattenabspielgerät
Former [1995/15]Changer-type disc playback device
Former [1995/15]Lecteur de disques à changeur
Examination procedure09.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
03.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.1999Fee for grant paid
08.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR05.01.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/09]FR02.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[ED]EP0632443  (NAKAMICHI CORP [JP]) [ED] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5177722  (NAKAMICHI NIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,15,17,19,20 * column A; figure 10 *;
 [A]GB2241104  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *