Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0647984

EP0647984 - A connecting construction between a coil wire and a lead wire and a stator having such a connecting construction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/15]A connecting construction between a coil wire and a lead wire
[1999/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsuba Corporation
2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome Kiryu-shi
Gunma 376-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Mitsuba Corporation
2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi, Gunma / JP
Former [1995/15]For all designated states
MITSUBA ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
2681, Hirosawacho 1-chome
Kiryu Gunma / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Arai, Makoto, Pana Heights Noguchi-206
200-12, Ainoshima, Hirosawacho
Kiryu-shi, Gunma / JP
02 / Shimoda, Yukihiro, Ri-Jyupiron A-201
3-189-1, Nishi-Katagaimachi
Maebashi-shi, Gunma / JP
[1995/15]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut , et al
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/15]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
D-81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date94115895.807.10.1994
[1995/15]
Priority number, dateJP1993027900712.10.1993         Original published format: JP 27900793
JP1993033950602.12.1993         Original published format: JP 33950693
[1995/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0647984
Date:12.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0647984
Date:18.06.1997
[1997/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0647984
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/24, H02K3/52
[1997/24]
Former International [1995/15]H01R4/24
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   IT [1995/15]
TitleGerman:Verbindungsvorrichtung für einen Wicklungsdraht und einen Anschlussdraht sowie Stator mit einer solchen Verbindungsvorrichtung[1999/12]
English:A connecting construction between a coil wire and a lead wire and a stator having such a connecting construction[1999/12]
French:Dispositif de connexion pour un fil d'enroulement et un fil de raccordement et un stator avec un tel dispositif de connexion[1999/12]
Former [1995/15]Verbindungsvorrichtung für einen Wicklungsdraht und einen Anschlussdraht
Former [1995/15]A connecting construction between a coil wire and a lead wire
Former [1995/15]Dispositif de connexion pour un fil d'enroulement et un fil de raccordement
Examination procedure26.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
19.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.1999Fee for grant paid
24.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0563409  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 47; figures 8,11 *;
 [Y]US4287446  (LILL JOHN F, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4132460  (PORTA GARY D) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 20; figures 2-4 *;
 [DA]JPS6122744
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860617), vol. 10, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 412), [DA] 1,2 * abstract *