Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0653513

EP0653513 - Process for drying a paper web and dryer section of a papermachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J.M. Voith GmbH & Co. Beteiligungen KG
St.-Poltener-Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[1999/37]
Former [1995/20]For all designated states
J.M. Voith GmbH
St. Pöltener Strasse 43
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Salter, Robert L.
Route 3, Box 587
Mena, AR 71953 / US
02 / Sollinger, Hans-Peter, Dr.
Germanenstrasse 161
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
[1995/23]
Former [1995/20]01 / Salter, Robert L.
Mena, AR 71953 / US
02 / Sollinger, Hans-Peter, Dr.
Germanenstrasse 161
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1999/35]
Former [1999/26]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [1995/20]Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt
Friedenstrasse 10
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date94116045.912.10.1994
[1995/20]
Priority number, dateUS1993015044910.11.1993         Original published format: US 150449
[1995/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0653513
Date:17.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0653513
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0653513
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:D21F5/04, D21F7/02
[1996/04]
Former International [1995/20]D21F5/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1995/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Trocknen einer Papierbahn sowie Trockenpartie einer Papiermaschine[1995/20]
English:Process for drying a paper web and dryer section of a papermachine[1995/20]
French:Procédé pour le séchage d'une bande de papier et section de séchage d'une machine à papier[1995/20]
Examination procedure31.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/31]
01.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.1999Fee for grant paid
05.02.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.01.2000
AT12.10.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/15]FR16.06.2000
AT12.10.2000
Former [2001/09]FR16.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE4404717  (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE592125  (KARL SCHOENEMANN);
 [A]DE1157902  (BELOIT IRON WORKS)