Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0651009

EP0651009 - Thermoplastic elastomer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE COMPANY LIMITED
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE COMPANY LIMITED
2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsujimoto, Motoyoshi
1051-1-603, Fujie
Akashi-shi / JP
02 / Miyake, Sumiya
32-36-203, Hirado-2-chome, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi / JP
[1995/18]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date94116491.519.10.1994
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateJP1993026391021.10.1993         Original published format: JP 26391093
JP1993030179501.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30179593
JP1993030179601.12.1993         Original published format: JP 30179693
[1995/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0651009
Date:03.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0651009
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08L21/00, C08L23/16, C08L23/22
[1995/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:Thermoplastische Elastomer-Zusammensetzung[1995/18]
English:Thermoplastic elastomer composition[1995/18]
French:Composition à base d'élastomère thermoplastique[1995/18]
Examination procedure28.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/26]
07.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.09.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.1997Fee for grant paid
28.11.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.1998  29.01.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Advanced Elastomer Systems L.P.
388 South main Street
Akron, OH 44311-1059 / US
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1998  29.01.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Advanced Elastomer Systems L.P.
388 South main Street
Akron, OH 44311-1059 / US
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1999/07]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1998   
Advanced Elastomer Systems L.P.
388 South main Street
Akron, OH 44311-1059 / US
Opponent's representative
Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
04.02.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.09.2000Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
05.10.2000Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.03.1998
NL25.03.1998
[2003/08]
Former [1999/42]IT25.03.1998
Documents cited:Search[DY]US4803244  (J.D. UMPLEBY) [DY] 1-13 * claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]EP0435173  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL) [Y] 1-13 * page 8, line 2 - line 11; claim 1 *