Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0649849

EP0649849 - Process for the preparation of cephalosporins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE Gesellschaft m.b.H.
6250 Kundl / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
6250 Kundi / AT
Former [1995/17]For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
A-6250 Kundl / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Danklmaier, Johann
Johannes Messner Weg 1
A-6130 Schwarz/Tyrol / AT
[1995/17]
Representative(s)Schaller, Hans , et al
Novartis AG, Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basle / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/25]Schaller, Hans , et al
Novartis AG, Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basle / CH
Former [1997/05]Wymann, Gérard , et al
Sandoz Technology Ltd. Patents-and Trademarks Division
4002 Basel / CH
Former [1995/17]Kleine Deters, Johannes , et al
c/o Sandoz Technology LTD., Patent- und Markenabteilung
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date94116660.521.10.1994
[1995/17]
Priority number, dateAT1993000214322.10.1993         Original published format: AT 214393
[1995/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0649849
Date:26.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0649849
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D501/04, C07D501/18
[1995/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/17]
Extension statesSI21.10.1994
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cephalosporinen[1995/17]
English:Process for the preparation of cephalosporins[1995/17]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de céphalosporines[1995/17]
Examination procedure16.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/33]
17.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2000Fee for grant paid
25.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98124140.9  / EP0908461
Opposition(s)28.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37]
Request for further processing for:27.06.1998Request for further processing filed
27.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.07.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0262744  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [AD] 1-3 * claims 1-3; examples 20-31; comparative examples 1 and 2 *;
 [AD]EP0204657  (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0343926  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [AD] 1-3 * example -; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE1795188  (GLAXO LAB LTD) [A] 1-3 * claims 58-72 *;
 [D]AT306240B  (GLAXO LAB LTD [GB]);
 [AD]  K. KOYAMA ET AL., "Synthesis and antibacterial activities of new 3-phenoxymethylcephalosporins", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (1992), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 535 - 541, XP002093283 [AD] 1-3 * page 536 *
 [A]  U. PINDUR ET AL., "Regioselective, Mild Acylation of 2-Methylindole ...", MONATSHEFTE FÜR CHEMIE, (1986), vol. 117, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00816532, pages 375 - 383, XP002093284 [A] 1,3 * page 380 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00816532
 [A]  M.J. EARLE ET AL., "Detailed Procedures for the Preparation of Dimethoxycarbenium and Trimethyloxonium Tetrafluoroborate", SYNLETT, (1991), no. 10, page 728, XP002093285 [A] 1,3