Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0651391

EP0651391 - Screw-threaded fastening device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.11.1999
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.1999Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.01.2000 [2000/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD
3-3-9, Shinbashi Minato-ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA AVE CO., LTD
3-3-9, Shinbashi
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakai, Masatoshi, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div.
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Kuwabara, Mitsutaka, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div.
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
[1995/18]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date94117020.127.10.1994
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateJP1993027164129.10.1993         Original published format: JP 27164193
[1995/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0651391
Date:03.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0651391
Date:05.02.1997
[1997/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/034, H04N7/24, G11B27/10, G11B20/00, H04N5/926
[1997/05]
Former International [1995/18]G11B27/034, H04N7/24, G11B27/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:Gewindebefestigung[1995/18]
English:Screw-threaded fastening device[1995/18]
French:Appareil de reproduction avec fonction de recherche[1995/18]
Examination procedure24.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/18]
30.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.07.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/01]
22.07.1999Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0461649  (AIWA CO LTD.) [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7,9,10;
 [Y]EP0517383  (IBM CORP.) [Y] 2-5,7,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0460764  (N. V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claims 1,7 *;
 [PX]EP0607904  (SONY CORP.) [PX] 1,6,8 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [PX]WO9407332  (SONY CORP.) [PX] 1,6,8 * figures 1-20; claims 1-72 *
 [A]  - JAN VAN DER MEER, "THE FULL MOTION SYSTEM FOR CD-I", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NY, US, (199211), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 910 - 920, XP000324653 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.179984