Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0651433

EP0651433 - Method of making a contact hole to a doped region [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Melzner, Hanno, Dipl.-Phys.
Kleinhelfendorf 4a
D-85655 Grosshelfendorf / DE
02 / Joswig, Hellmut, Dr.
30 Lake Forrest Drive
Burlington, VT / US
03 / Muller, Wolfgang, Dr.
HC 33 Box 751
Bolton Valley, VT 05477 / US
[1995/18]
Application number, filing date94117264.502.11.1994
[1995/18]
Priority number, dateDE1993433735502.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4337355
[1995/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0651433
Date:03.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0651433
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/285, H01L21/321
[1995/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kontaktlochs zu einem dotierten Bereich[1995/18]
English:Method of making a contact hole to a doped region[1995/18]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un trou de contact sur une région dopée[1995/18]
Examination procedure18.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/28]
09.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1999Fee for grant paid
18.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL12.07.2000
[2003/08]
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0543158  (IBM [US]) [YD] 1-5 * column 5, line 32 - column 7, line 14 *;
 [PA]EP0567815  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PA] 1-4,7,9,10 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 32 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4573257  (HULSEWEH TERRY S [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 55 * * figures 2A-2F *
 [Y]  Y.YAMAMOTO ET AL., "SDX:A NOVEL SELF-ALIGNED TECHNIQUE AND ITS APPLICATION TO HIGH-SPEED BIPOLAR LSI'S", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, NEW YORK US, (198710), vol. 35, no. 10, pages 1601 - 1608, [Y] 1-5 * page 1603, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 1605, column 2, paragraph 3 *