Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0710523

EP0710523 - Method and apparatus for deburring and calibrating of forged workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brockhaus Söhne GmbH & Co. KG
In den Hofwiesen 13
D-58840 Plettenberg-Kückelheim / DE
[1996/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Baberg, Günter
Am Bauckhahn 24
D-58840 Plettenberg / DE
02 / Bachmann, Horst
Steinernes Stück 23
D-96472 Rödental / DE
[1996/19]
Representative(s)Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/19]Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date94117431.004.11.1994
[1996/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0710523
Date:08.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0710523
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:B23Q7/03, B21J13/08, B21K1/76
[1996/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/19]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entgräten und Kalibrieren von in einem Umformaggregat geschmiedeten Werkstücken[1996/19]
English:Method and apparatus for deburring and calibrating of forged workpieces[1996/19]
French:Procédé et appareil pour ébavurer et calibrer des pièces forgées[1996/19]
Examination procedure12.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
21.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.1999Fee for grant paid
08.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES16.02.2000
FR16.02.2000
GB16.02.2000
IT16.02.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]ES16.02.2000
FR16.02.2000
GB16.02.2000
Former [2002/26]ES16.02.2000
GB16.02.2000
FR13.07.2000
Former [2001/16]GB16.02.2000
FR13.07.2000
Former [2001/12]GB16.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1157944  (TEXTILE MACHINE WORKS [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * page 5, line 37 - line 59 *;
 [Y]GB2090174  (TEKSID SPA) [Y] 8,9 * page 2, line 72 - line 82 *;
 [A]US5078254  (COLONIUS RAY E [US], et al) [A] 10,18 * column 9, line 40 - line 65 *;
 [A]DE2002987  (GULF & WESTERN IND PROD CO) [A] 11-13,16,17 * page 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2920822  (LANGENSTEIN & SCHEMANN AG) [A] 19 * page 14, line 4 - line 15; figures 2,5 *;
 [YA]  RAU, "Achsschenkel und Kurbelwellen automatisch geschmiedet", VDI ZEITSCHRIFT, DUSSELDORF DE, (199204), vol. 134, no. 4, pages 103 - 104, XP000301349 [Y] 1-3,6,7 * page 104, paragraph L * [A] 14,15
 [A]  PISCHEL, "Stand und Entwicklungstendenzen beim Herstellen von Pleueln", WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB, MUNCHEN DE, (199012), vol. 123, no. 12, pages 949 - 955, XP000173635 [A] 1,8