blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0653347

EP0653347 - Front gear for a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77, Oimatsu-cho
Sakai-ku
Sakai City
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Former [1995/20]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3 cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kojima, Satoru
c/o Shimano Inc., 77, Oimatsucho 3 cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Nishimoto, Naohiro
c/o Shimano Inc., 77, Oimatsucho 3 cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
[1995/20]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Former [2007/31]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Former [2003/30]Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Grosse, Bockhorni & Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [1995/20]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
D-81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date94117621.608.11.1994
[1995/20]
Priority number, dateJP1993006091112.11.1993         Original published format: JP 6091193
JP1993028335812.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28335893
JP1993028335912.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28335993
JP1994008421722.04.1994         Original published format: JP 8421794
JP1994008421822.04.1994         Original published format: JP 8421894
[1995/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0653347
Date:17.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0653347
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1995
ClassificationIPC:B62M9/12, F16C1/18
[1995/20]
CPC:
B62M9/136 (EP,US); B62M9/1342 (EP,US); B62M9/137 (EP,US);
F16C1/18 (EP,US); F16C2326/28 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/20]
TitleGerman:Vorderer Umwerfer für ein Fahrrad[1995/20]
English:Front gear for a bicycle[1995/20]
French:Dérailleur avant pour une bicyclette[1995/20]
Examination procedure03.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/35]
05.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1999Fee for grant paid
27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.11.2000  12.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SRAM Deutschland GmbH
Romstr. 1
97424 Schweinfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/49]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2000  12.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SRAM Deutschland GmbH
Romstr. 1
97424 Schweinfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Beyer, Andreas, Dr.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2001/04]
Opponent(s)01  24.11.2000  12.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
SRAM Deutschland GmbH
Romstr. 1
97424 Schweinfurt / DE
09.01.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.11.2003Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.10.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/09]
Appeal following opposition23.02.2004Appeal received No.  T0311/04
29.04.2004Statement of grounds filed
09.10.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
09.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.10.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.11.2006
[2008/05]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2346204  (JUY LUCIEN [FR]) [A] 1* figure - *;
 [A]US4330137  (NAGANO MASASHI) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.